NH SB166 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB166
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by the Governor on 07/17/2020; Chapter 0021; Effective 09/15/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-22 - Signed by the Governor on 07/17/2020; Chapter 0021; Effective 09/15/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to competitive electricity supplier requirements under net energy metering.
Title
Relative to competitive electricity supplier requirements under net energy metering.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Rep. John Mann [D] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] | Rep. Troy Merner [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Concur (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 203 N: 131 NV: 39 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - House - OTPA (Y: 203 N: 131 NV: 39 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/17/2020; Chapter 0021; Effective 09/15/2020 |
2020-07-10 | House | Enrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 71 |
2020-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9 |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 06/29/2020; Senate Journal 9 |
2020-01-09 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2785h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-131 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 48 |
2020-01-09 | House | Amendment # 2019-2785h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/09/2020 House Journal 2 P. 48 |
2019-11-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2785h (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 30 |
2019-10-21 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-10-09 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-09-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/09/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-08-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 09/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-06-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-05-22 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/15/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-05-01 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2019-1173s and 2019-1345s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2019-1345s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1173s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1173s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB166 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate