NH SB165 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 271; Effective 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to net energy metering by low-moderate income community solar projects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to net energy metering by low-moderate income community solar projects.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 229 N: 113 NV: 35 Abs: 23) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-24SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/19/2019; Chapter 271; Effective 07/01/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1827h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 229-113 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 46
2019-05-23HouseAmendment # 2019-1827h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 46
2019-05-08HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-08HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1827h for 05/23/2019 (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 25 P. 12
2019-05-01HouseExecutive Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-17HousePublic Hearing: 04/24/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1169s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1169s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1169s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-06SenateHearing: 03/12/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback