NH SB165 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-19 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-19 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the social innovation financing trust fund.
Title
Establishing the social innovation financing trust fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 2/11/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |