NH SB165 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Senate Sen. Morse Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.226
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Senate Sen. Morse Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.226
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Medicaid uncompensated care fund and the Medicaid enhancement tax.
Title
Relative to the Medicaid uncompensated care fund and the Medicaid enhancement tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Gary Lambert [R] | Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] | Sen. Charles Morse [R] |
Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Senate Sen. Morse Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.226 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Pending Motion OT3rdg | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1179s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.226 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Committee Amendment 1179s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.226 | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-1179s, 3/30/11; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/11, Room 103, State House, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Finance, Senate Journal 5, Pg.46 |