NH SB163 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - II. Remainder Effective 07/02/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to recommend legislation to prepare for projected sea level rise and other coastal and coastal watershed hazards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to recommend legislation to prepare for projected sea level rise and other coastal and coastal watershed hazards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-03SenateII. Remainder Effective 07/02/13
2013-07-03SenateI. Section 2 Effective 12/01/16
2013-07-03SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/02/13; Chapter 0188
2013-06-12SenateEnrolled
2013-06-12HouseEnrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654
2013-06-06SenateSen. Prescott Moved Concur with House Amendment 1367h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1367h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 228-124; House Journal 41, PG.1405-1407
2013-05-08HouseAmendment #1367h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1405
2013-05-01HouseProposed Committee Amendment #2013-1367h; House Calendar36, PG.1221
2013-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1367h for May 8 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1203
2013-04-17HouseExecutive Session: 4/24/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 ==Or One Hour Following House Session==
2013-04-10HousePublic Hearing: 4/16/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2013-04-03HouseIntroduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 35, PG.1191
2013-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1154s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg;
2013-03-28SenateSen. Watters Floor Amendment #2013-1154s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote;
2013-03-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/28/13; Senate Calendar 13
2013-02-21SenateHearing: === TIME CHANGE === 3/6/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10
2013-02-12SenateHearing: 3/6/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9
2013-01-31SenateIntroduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback