NH SB161 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - II. Remainder Effective 06/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to evaluate the direct care workforce and preparedness of long-term care and support services for aging adults with dementia or other cognitive brain injuries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to evaluate the direct care workforce and preparedness of long-term care and support services for aging adults with dementia or other cognitive brain injuries.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-19SenateII. Remainder Effective 06/16/2017
2017-06-19SenateI. Section 2 Effective 12/01/2017
2017-06-19SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/16/2017; Chapter 0152
2017-06-01SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19
2017-06-01HouseEnrolled 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 127
2017-05-24SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1837e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/18/2017); Senate Journal 18
2017-05-24HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1837e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/18/2017 House Journal 16 P. 9
2017-05-11SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/11/2017; Senate Journal 16
2017-05-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1524h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 5
2017-05-04HouseAmendment #2017-1524h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 5
2017-04-26HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1524h for 05/04/2017 (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 5
2017-04-19HouseExecutive Session: 04/25/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-04-12HousePublic Hearing: 04/19/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-04-04HouseIntroduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 27
2017-03-29SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-0975s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
2017-03-29SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-0975s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
2017-03-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0975s, 03/29/2017; Senate Calendar 16
2017-03-13SenateHearing: 03/20/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 15
2017-03-09Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/14/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback