NH SB159 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture
Pending: House Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study unlimited service area permits for landfills and out of state waste coming into New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study unlimited service area permits for landfills and out of state waste coming into New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture
2023-03-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2023-0837s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10
2023-03-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2023-0837s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/16/2023; Senate Journal 10
2023-03-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0837s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13
2023-02-09SenateHearing: 02/15/2023, Room 103, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback