NH SB159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB159
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to net energy metering limits for customer-generators.
Title
Relative to net energy metering limits for customer-generators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-11-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2844h (Vote 12-7; Regular Calendar) |
2019-11-04 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/06/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-10-21 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-06-10 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 06/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-30 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 04/24/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 73 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1174s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-1174s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1174s, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2019, Room 103, State House, 08:45 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB159 (Carry Over) 2019-11-14 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate