NH SB159 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to qualifying medical conditions for the purposes of therapeutic cannabis.
Title
Relative to qualifying medical conditions for the purposes of therapeutic cannabis.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 18 |
2017-05-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 06/01/2017 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 8 |
2017-05-16 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/23/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-04-19 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/25/2017 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-04-12 | House | Public Hearing: 04/19/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 27 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/29/2017; Senate Calendar 16 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 03/20/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/14/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |