NH SB159 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0154; Effective 06/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0154; Effective 06/12/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinstating the division for children, youth and families advisory board.
Title
Reinstating the division for children, youth and families advisory board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0154; Effective 06/12/2015 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/28/2015); Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Concurs with House Amendment #1365h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 14 |
2015-05-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1365h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1748 |
2015-05-06 | House | Amendment #1365h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG. 1748 |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1365h for May 6 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG. 1507 |
2015-04-22 | House | Executive Session: 4/28/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 206 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Children and Family Law (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0975s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0975s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0975s, 3/26/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Hearing: 3/10/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |