NH SB159 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0185; Effective 07/02/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0185; Effective 07/02/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting drivers of eligible agricultural and farm vehicles from certain federal motor carrier regulations and relative to drivers license renewals of members of the armed forces and federal employees and their spouses.
Title
Exempting drivers of eligible agricultural and farm vehicles from certain federal motor carrier regulations and relative to drivers license renewals of members of the armed forces and federal employees and their spouses.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Gene Chandler [R] | Sen. James Rausch [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Joe Duarte [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Rep. Thomas Walsh [R] |
Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/02/2013; Chapter 0185; Effective 07/02/2013 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-12 | House | Enrolled, Recess of 6/5/13; House Journal 49, PG.1654 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Moved Concur with House Amendment 1531h (NT), Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-05-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1531h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1471-1472 |
2013-05-22 | House | Amendment #1531h(NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 43, PG.1471-1472 |
2013-05-15 | House | Proposed Committee Amendment #2013-1531h (New Title); House Calendar39, PG.1332-1333 |
2013-05-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1531h(NT) for May 22 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar39, PG.1262 |
2013-05-01 | House | Executive Session: 5/14/2013 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-04-17 | House | Public Hearing on Proposed Amendment #2013-1300h(NT): 4/24/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-04-17 | House | Public Hearing: 4/24/2013 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 203 ==Or Following House Session== |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 31, PG.1075 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 0367s, 0715s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Sen. Rausch Floor Amendment #2013-0715s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0367s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0367s, 3/7/13; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 2/12/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 5 |