NH SB158 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-18 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the formula for funding an adequate education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the formula for funding an adequate education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-18SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted === BILL KILLED ===; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-09SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/18/2021; Senate Calendar 15
2021-02-11SenateRemote Hearing: 02/16/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback