NH SB157 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Senate Law Without Signature 6/16/11; Eff. Date 7/1/11, Chapter 0202; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-16 - Senate Law Without Signature 6/16/11; Eff. Date 7/1/11, Chapter 0202; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the division of weights and measures and fees for licensing weighing devices and the definition of service technician.
Title
Relative to the division of weights and measures and fees for licensing weighing devices and the definition of service technician.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-01 - House - OTP (Y: 264 N: 110 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - OTP/AM 1478H (Y: 234 N: 92 NV: 70 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-27 - House - OTP/AM 1478H (Y: 234 N: 92 NV: 70 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-16 | Senate Law Without Signature 6/16/11; Eff. Date 7/1/11, Chapter 0202; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1726 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Carson Concurs with House Amendment #1478h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.550 | |
2011-06-01 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 264-110; House Journal 48, PG.1663-1665 | |
2011-05-24 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for June 1 (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 43, PG.1502 | |
2011-05-17 | House Executive Session: 5/24/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-05-17 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/24/2011 8:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-05-10 | House Full Committee Work Session: 5/17/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-05-03 | House Public Hearing: 5/10/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-04-27 | House Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 40, PG.1374 | |
2011-04-27 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1478h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 234-92; House Journal 40, PG.1372-1374 | |
2011-04-27 | House Amendment #1478h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1372 | |
2011-04-21 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1478h; House Calendar 33, PG.1083 | |
2011-04-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1478h for April 27 (Vote 11-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1069-1070 | |
2011-04-05 | House Executive Session: 4/19/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-04-05 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/14/2011 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-29 | House Public Hearing: 4/5/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 30, PG.1037 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.178 | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/23/11; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3; Senate Journal 8, Pg.89 | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, Session Date: 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-09 | Senate Hearing: 2/17/11, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration, Senate Journal 5, Pg.46 |