NH SB153 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing state holidays for biennial state primary elections and quadrennial presidential primary elections.
Title
Establishing state holidays for biennial state primary elections and quadrennial presidential primary elections.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] | Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Rep. John Bordenet [D] | Rep. Jeffrey Goley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 01/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |