NH SB152 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2016; Chapter 0117; Effective 07/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-24 - Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2016; Chapter 0117; Effective 07/19/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to criminal history records checks for school employees and designated school volunteers.
Title
Relative to criminal history records checks for school employees and designated school volunteers.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Rep. Joseph Lachance [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/20/2016; Chapter 0117; Effective 07/19/2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/05/2016); Senate Journal 17 |
2016-05-12 | House | Enrolled 05/11/2016 House Journal 38 P. 46 |
2016-04-07 | House | Referral Waived by Committee Chair per House Rule 46(f) 04/06/2016 |
2016-04-06 | House | Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 12 |
2016-04-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 12 |
2016-04-06 | House | FLAM #2016-1105h (Rep. Adams): Amendment Failed Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 10 |
2016-04-06 | House | Special Order to first order of business (Rep. Cloutier): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 10 |
2016-03-30 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1105h [^] House Calendar 21 P. 12 |
2016-03-30 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/06/2016 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 21 P. 12 |
2016-03-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/15/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-03-08 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2016 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-02-16 | House | Introduced 02/11/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 17 P. 50 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0206s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/04/2016; Senate Journal 4 |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0206s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/04/2016 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0206s, 02/04/2016; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 3084s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Ordered to the Committee on Judiciary; 01/14/2016; Senate Journal 2 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Sen. Kelly Floor Amendment #2015-3084s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 2 |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 2412s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 01/14/2016 |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2412s, 01/14/2016; Senate Calendar 1 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | Special Order SB 152 to 01/14/2016, Without Objection, Motion Adopted |
2015-10-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2412s, 1/6/16; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Hearing: 9/22/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:25 a.m.; Senate Calendar 34 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Hearing: 2/17/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4 |