NH SB152 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-27 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/11/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-27 - House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/11/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to participation in state employees' group insurance by members of the general court.
Title
Relative to participation in state employees' group insurance by members of the general court.
Sponsors
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Sen. Matthew Houde [D] | Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] |
Sen. Bob Odell [R] | Rep. Daniel Sullivan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-27 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/11/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-05-25 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 6/2/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-05-17 | House Retained in Committee | |
2011-05-06 | House Executive Session: 5/17/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-04-28 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 5/10/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-04-27 | House Recommit (Rep C.McGuire): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1383-1384 | |
2011-04-27 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Antosz); House Journal 40, PG.1352 | |
2011-04-21 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1483h; House Calendar 33, PG.1082 | |
2011-04-21 | House Committee Report: Ough to Pass with Amendment #1483h for April 27 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1067 | |
2011-04-05 | House Executive Session: 4/19/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-29 | House Public Hearing: 4/12/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 | |
2011-03-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 30, PG.1036 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 9, Pg.162 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0759s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.124 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Committee Amendment 0759s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.124 | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0759s, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-02-17 | Senate Hearing: 2/24/11, Room 100, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration, Senate Journal 5, Pg.46 |