NH SB151 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-12-05 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to arbitration agreements in nursing home contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to arbitration agreements in nursing home contracts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-05SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study
2017-03-29SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
2017-03-23SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/29/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2017-03-13SenateHearing: 03/20/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 15
2017-03-09Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/14/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback