NH SB151 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2015; Chapter 0251; Effective 09/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2015; Chapter 0251; Effective 09/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring inclusion of home educated pupils in the definition of average daily membership in attendance.
Title
Requiring inclusion of home educated pupils in the definition of average daily membership in attendance.
Sponsors
Sen. Molly Kelly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2015; Chapter 0251; Effective 09/11/2015 |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-07-02 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); House Journal 54, PG. 2141 |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2119c; Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2119c: Adopted, DV 322-26; House Journal 54, PG. 2108 |
2015-06-11 | House | Conference Committee Report #2015-2119c, House Amendment, Filed |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Conferee Change; Senator Watters Replaces Senator Kelly |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/10/2015, 12:30 p.m., Room 102, Legislative Office Building |
2015-06-09 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Ladd, Balcom, Umberger, Shaw (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1954 |
2015-06-09 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Hinch): Motion Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 6/3/2015); House Journal 44, PG. 1954 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Avard, and Kelly |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Sen. Reagan Moved Nonconcur with House Amendments #1263h and #1948h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1948h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1927 |
2015-06-03 | House | Amendment #1948h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1927 |
2015-05-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2015-05-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1948h for Jun 3 (Vote 13-10; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 39, PG. 1636 |
2015-05-20 | House | Executive Session: 5/26/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 201 |
2015-05-07 | House | Division II Work Session: 5/19/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2015-04-15 | House | Division II Work Session: 4/22/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209 |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred to Finance; House Journal 34, PG. 1534 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1263h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1534 |
2015-04-15 | House | Amendment #1263h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1534 |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1263h for Apr 15 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1301-1302 |
2015-04-01 | House | Continued Executive Session: 4/7/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-24 | House | Executive Session: 3/31/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207==RECESSED== |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Education; House Journal 26, PG. 1275 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 5 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/12/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Hearing: 2/3/15, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 4 |