NH SB150 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a dental benefit under the state Medicaid program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a dental benefit under the state Medicaid program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-24SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17
2021-03-11SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0612s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-11SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0612s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-03SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0612s, 03/11/2021; Senate Calendar 14
2021-02-11SenateRemote Hearing: 02/18/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=257&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB150
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=250&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=250
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=128&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0150&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB150&ddlsponsors=&lsr=257
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=129&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0150&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB150&ddlsponsors=&lsr=257
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=262&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0150&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB150&ddlsponsors=&lsr=257
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=263&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0150&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB150&ddlsponsors=&lsr=257

Bill Comments

feedback