NH SB150 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Signed by the Governor on 05/12/2017; Chapter 0051; Effective 07/11/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to pharmacist administration of vaccines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to pharmacist administration of vaccines.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15SenateSigned by the Governor on 05/12/2017; Chapter 0051; Effective 07/11/2017
2017-05-02SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16
2017-05-03HouseEnrolled 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 26
2017-04-20HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 6
2017-04-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2017 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 5
2017-04-11HouseExecutive Session: 04/11/2017 Legislative Office Building 205
2017-04-04HousePublic Hearing: 04/11/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205
2017-04-04HouseIntroduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 11 P. 27
2017-03-29SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/29/2017; Senate Journal 11
2017-03-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/29/2017; Senate Calendar 16
2017-03-13SenateHearing: 03/20/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 15
2017-03-09Senate==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/14/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback