NH SB15 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-11-30 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the law regarding therapeutic use of cannabis.
Title
Relative to the law regarding therapeutic use of cannabis.
Sponsors
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | House | Died on Table |
2017-05-04 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Reconsider SB 15 (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/04/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 10 |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2017 (Vote 17-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 8 |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/22/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/21/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 8 P. 44 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/19/2017; Senate Journal 4 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Withdraws Floor Amendment 2017-0048s; 01/19/2017; Senate Journal 4 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Offered Floor Amendment #2017-0048s; 01/19/2017; Senate Journal 4 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/19/2017; Senate Calendar 6 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 5 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |