NH SB149 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adopting omnibus legislation on health and human services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adopting omnibus legislation on health and human services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 1055s (Y: 13 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19
2021-06-03HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1295h: Motion Adopted DV 255-121 06/03/2021
2021-06-03HouseFLAM # 2021-1767h (Rep. Cushman): Amendment Failed DV 146-230 06/03/2021
2021-06-03HouseAmendment # 2021-1295h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021
2021-05-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-05-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1295h (Vote 18-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 24
2021-05-05HouseExecutive Session: 05/17/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95933161404
2021-04-20HousePublic Hearing: 05/03/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91978983838 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-04-13HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 04/09/2021 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
2021-04-01SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-1055s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-04-01SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-1055s, Regular Calendar 13Y-11N, Amendment Adopted; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1055s, 04/01/2021; Senate Calendar 17A
2021-03-18SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0788s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-18SenateCommittee Amendment # 2021-0788s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0788s, 03/18/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2021-02-11SenateRemote Hearing: 02/18/2021, 02:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2021-02-09SenateIntroduced 02/04/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1074&sy=2021&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB149
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&id=1071&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1071
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=1071
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2021&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1071
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=260&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0149&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB149&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1074
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=261&sy=2021&lb=S&eb=SB0149&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2021&txtbillnumber=SB149&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1074

Bill Comments 750

feedback