NH SB149 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 198; Effective 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 198; Effective 09/08/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to voluntary application of the uniform prudent management of institutional funds act to certain charitable trusts.
Title
Relative to voluntary application of the uniform prudent management of institutional funds act to certain charitable trusts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/10/2019; Chapter 198; Effective 09/08/2019 |
2019-06-18 | House | Enrolled 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 18 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-05 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019 House Journal 17 P. 21 |
2019-05-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 7 |
2019-05-15 | House | Executive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-05-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 05/14/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 2 |
2019-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 2 |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/08/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 3 |
2019-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 04/18/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-09 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-04-02 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-26 | House | Public Hearing: 04/02/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 11 P. 70 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; Senate Journal 6 |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Senate Calendar 11 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |