NH SB148 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-19 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 148 Become Law: Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Veto Overridden by necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to notification to public employees regarding their right to join or not join a union.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to notification to public employees regarding their right to join or not join a union.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-19 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - Senate - Veto Override (Y: 218 N: 139 NV: 14 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Concur (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Concur (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-19SenateNotwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 148 Become Law: Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Veto Overridden by necessary two-thirds vote; 09/19/2019; Senate Journal 22
2019-09-19HouseVeto Sustained 09/19/2019: Regular Calendar 218-139 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 22 P. 16
2019-07-16SenateVetoed by Governor 07/12/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 16Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-13SenateSen. Feltes Moved Reconsideration on the vote taken by this body on SB 148, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-13SenateSen. Cavanaugh Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1770h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 10
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1770h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 10
2019-05-01HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1770h for 05/08/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 6
2019-04-24HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 05/01/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-24HouseExecutive Session: 05/01/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-16HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 04/24/2019 08:30 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-10House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/17/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-03HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-27SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1165s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-27SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1165s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1165s, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-14SenateHearing: 03/19/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1023&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB148
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=1075&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1075
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1075
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=214&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0148&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB148&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1023
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=219&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0148&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB148&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1023
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=278&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0148&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB148&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1023
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=243&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0148&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB148&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1023

Bill Comments

feedback