NH SB148 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - II. Remainder Effective 06/02/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a commission to study grandfamilies in New Hampshire.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a commission to study grandfamilies in New Hampshire.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-07SenateII. Remainder Effective 06/02/2017
2017-06-07SenateI. Section 2 Effective 09/01/2018
2017-06-07SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/02/2017; Chapter 0084
2017-05-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16
2017-05-11HouseEnrolled 05/04/2017 House Journal 15 P. 47
2017-05-03SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1565e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/27/2017); Senate Journal 16
2017-05-02HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2017-1565e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 25
2017-04-20HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 2
2017-04-12HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/20/2017 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 3
2017-04-04HouseExecutive Session: 04/11/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2017-03-16HousePublic Hearing: 03/21/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 8 P. 45
2017-02-09SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5
2017-01-31SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2017; Senate Calendar 9
2017-01-26SenateHearing: 01/31/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 8
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback