NH SB148 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0103; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the shellfish inspection program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the shellfish inspection program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0103; Effective 01/01/2016
2015-05-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14
2015-05-06HouseEnrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1779
2015-04-30SenateSen. Birdsell Concurs with House Amendment #1226h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12
2015-04-15HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1226h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1537
2015-04-15HouseAmendment #1226h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1537
2015-04-09HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1226h for Apr 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1302
2015-03-31HouseExecutive Session: 4/7/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2015-03-25HousePublic Hearing: 3/31/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 303
2015-03-24HouseIntroduced and Referred to Environment and Agriculture (in recess of 3/12/2015); House Journal 26, PG. 1276
2015-03-19SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9
2015-03-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/19/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 13
2015-03-04SenateHearing: 3/11/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback