NH SB148 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - II. Remainder Effective 07/24/13
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to electric renewable portfolio standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to electric renewable portfolio standards.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-25SenateII. Remainder Effective 07/24/13
2013-07-25SenateI. Section 5 & 6 Effective 01/01/14
2013-07-25SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/24/13; Chapter 0272
2013-06-26SenateEnrolled
2013-06-26HouseEnrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714
2013-06-26SenateConference Committee Report 2177c; Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-06-26HouseConference Committee Report #2177c Adopted, Regular Calendar 225-128; House Journal 52, PG.1676-1678
2013-06-20HouseConference Committee Report #2013-2177c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar47, PG.1537
2013-06-20SenateConferee Change; Senator Bragdon Replaces Senator Bradley
2013-06-20SenateConferee Change; Senator Odell Replaces Senator Sanborn
2013-06-20Senate==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/20/13 10:45 a.m., Room 302, Legislative Office Building
2013-06-20Senate==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/20/13 9:30 a.m., Room 302, Legislative Office Building, ==RECESSED==
2013-06-19Senate==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/19/13 4:30 p.m., Room 103, State House ==RECESSED==
2013-06-19Senate==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/19/13 3:00 p.m., Room 103, State House ==RECESSED==
2013-06-14SenateCommittee of Conference Meeting:=== ROOM CHANGE === 6/19/2013 1:00 PM State House 103 ==RECESSED==
2013-06-13HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps Borden, Butler, Schlachman, and Flanders [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1653
2013-06-13HouseHouse Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1653
2013-06-12SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Bradley, Pierce
2013-06-12SenateSen. Prescott Moved Nonconcur with House Amendments #1730h and #2010h, New Title; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-06-05HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1730h and #2010h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 170-113; House Journal 49, PG.1629-1642
2013-06-05HouseFloor Amendment #2013-2010h(NT) (Rep Butler): Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 166-119; House Journal 49, PG.1630-1640
2013-06-05HouseAmendment #1730h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 49, PG.1629-1630
2013-05-22HouseProposed Committee Amendment #2013-1730h; House Calendar42, PG.1457-1459
2013-05-22HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1730h for June 5 (Vote 16-1; Regular Calendar); House Calendar42, PG.1433-1434
2013-05-08HouseExecutive Session: 5/15/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305-307
2013-04-23HouseFull Committee Work Session: 5/1/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2013-04-09HousePublic Hearing: 4/17/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
2013-04-03HouseIntroduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 35, PG.1191
2013-03-28SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1069s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg;
2013-03-28SenateCommittee Amendment 1069s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-03-21SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1069s, 3/28/13; Senate Calendar 13
2013-02-12SenateHearing: 2/20/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9
2013-01-03SenateIntroduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback