NH SB148 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Senate Law Without Signature 7/14/11; Eff. Date 07/01/11, Chapter 0266; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to health insurance coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to health insurance coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-04 - House - OTP/AM 1431H(NT) (Y: 261 N: 104 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - MAJ AM 1431H(NT) (Y: 259 N: 106 NV: 31 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-14 Senate Law Without Signature 7/14/11; Eff. Date 07/01/11, Chapter 0266; Art 44, Pt II, NH Constitution
2011-06-22 Senate Enrolled
2011-06-22 House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1860
2011-06-22 Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2011-2523e, New Title, Adopted, Voice Vote
2011-06-22 House Enrolled Bill Amendment #2523e(NT) Adopted; House Journal 57, PG.1859
2011-06-22 Senate Conference Committee Report 2403c; Adopted, Voice Vote
2011-06-22 House Conference Committee Report #2403c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 57, PG.1815
2011-06-16 House Conference Committee Report #2011-2403c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 49, PG.1675
2011-06-15 Senate Conferee Change; Senator Bradley Replaces Senator Houde
2011-06-14 Senate C of C Meeting: == RECONVENE === 6/15/2011, 10:00 a.m., Room 100, State House
2011-06-07 Senate C of C Meeting: == RECESSED === 6/7/2011, 9:00 a.m., Room 100, State House
2011-06-01 Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/7/2011 9:00 a.m., Room 100, State House
2011-06-01 House Speaker Appoints: Reps Hunt, Flanders, Manuse, and Leonard; House Journal 48, PG.1624
2011-06-01 House House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Hunt): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1624
2011-05-25 Senate President Appoints: Senators Prescott, De Blois and Houde; Senate Journal 18, Pg.390
2011-05-25 Senate Sen. Prescott Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1431h; New Title, Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 18, Pg.390
2011-05-04 House Reconsideration (Rep Manuse): Motion Failed Division Vote 97-265; House Journal 42, PG.1451
2011-05-04 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1431h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 261-104; House Journal 42, PG.1440-1446
2011-05-04 House Amendment #1431h(NT) Adopted, Regular Calendar 259-106; House Journal 42, PG.1440-1444
2011-04-28 House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 36, PG.1247
2011-04-28 House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-1431h (New Title); House Calendar 36, PG.1279-1280
2011-04-28 House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1431h(NT) for May 4 (Vote 12-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.1247
2011-04-12 House Executive Session: 4/21/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2011-04-12 House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 Insurance/Consumer Protection Div
2011-03-22 House Public Hearing: 4/14/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 Insurance/Consumer Protection Div ==Work Session May Follow==
2011-03-16 House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 28, Pg.883
2011-03-09 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 8, Pg.99
2011-03-09 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0456s, New Title, Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.85
2011-03-09 Senate Committee Amendment 0456s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.85
2011-02-23 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0456s, New Title, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14
2011-02-10 Senate Hearing: 2/22/11, Room 100, State House, 9:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11
2011-01-19 Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Senate Journal 3, Pg.38

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback