NH SB147 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by the Governor on 06/15/2017; Chapter 0116; Effective 06/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by the Governor on 06/15/2017; Chapter 0116; Effective 06/15/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study mental health and social service business process alignment and information system interoperability.
Title
Establishing a committee to study mental health and social service business process alignment and information system interoperability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/15/2017; Chapter 0116; Effective 06/15/2017 |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/31/2017); Senate Journal 19 |
2017-06-01 | House | Enrolled 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 127 |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2017; Senate Journal 17 |
2017-04-20 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0904h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 5 |
2017-04-20 | House | Amendment #2017-0904h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/20/2017 House Journal 14 P. 5 |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0904h (NT) for 04/20/2017 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 20 P. 5 |
2017-03-15 | House | Executive Session: 03/22/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-09 | House | Public Hearing: 03/15/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2017; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 5 |