NH SB147 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on June 8 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2011; Effective 06/02/2011; Chapter 0125
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Medicaid managed care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to Medicaid managed care.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-06-08 Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/02/2011; Effective 06/02/2011; Chapter 0125
2011-05-25 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 19, Pg.396
2011-05-25 House Enrolled; House Journal 46, PG.1609
2011-05-18 Senate Enrolled Bill Amendment #2011-1827e Adopted; Senate Journal 18, Pg.361
2011-05-04 House Enrolled Bill Amendment #1827e Adopted; House Journal 42, PG.1492
2011-05-04 Senate Sen. Bradley Concurs with House Amendments #1564h and #1610h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 15, Pg.311
2011-04-27 House Reconsideration (Rep Hess): Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1383
2011-04-27 House Ought to Pass with Amendments #1564h and #1610h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1382-1383
2011-04-27 House Floor Amendment #2011-1610h (Rep Hess) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1382-1383
2011-04-27 House Amendment #1564h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1382
2011-04-26 House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1564h; House Calendar 33A, PG.1087-1088
2011-04-26 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1564h for April 27 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 33A, PG.1085
2011-04-19 House Continued Executive Session: 4/26/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 If Needed
2011-04-13 House Executive Session: 4/21/2011 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2011-04-06 House Public Hearing: 4/12/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202
2011-03-28 House Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 30, PG.1037
2011-03-23 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187
2011-03-23 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1019s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.178
2011-03-23 Senate Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2011-1019s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.178
2011-03-17 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/23/2011; Senate Calendar 16
2011-03-16 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0790s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3
2011-03-16 Senate Committee Amendment 0790s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2011-03-10 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0790s, Session Date: 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15
2011-02-03 Senate Hearing: 2/17/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10
2011-01-19 Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services, Senate Journal 3, Pg.38

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback