NH SB146 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2424h for Jan 6 (Vote 11-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 25-26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2424h for Jan 6 (Vote 11-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 25-26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to accessory dwelling units.
Title
Relative to accessory dwelling units.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. John Hunt [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Jerry Little [R] | Rep. Carolyn Matthews [R] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2424h for Jan 6 (Vote 11-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 25-26 |
2015-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/6/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-08-03 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/9/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-05-12 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-04-28 | House | Executive Session: 5/12/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-04-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/5/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-31 | House | ==CANCELLED==Executive Session: 4/23/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing: 4/21/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 26, PG. 1275 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 0740s and 0832s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Floor Amendment #2015-0832s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0740s, Division 13Y-9N, Amendment Adopted |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0740s, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/4/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |