NH SB143 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0031; Effective 07/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0031; Effective 07/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to defining phased development.
Title
Relative to defining phased development.
Sponsors
Sen. David Boutin [R] | Rep. John Hunt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0031; Effective 07/06/2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-29 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 36, PG. 1597 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1548 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1306 |
2015-03-17 | House | Executive Session: 3/26/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 11:40 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/12/15; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/4/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |