NH SB143 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2013; Chapter 0218; Effective 07/01/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-11 - Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2013; Chapter 0218; Effective 07/01/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to benefits for unemployed persons who are attempting to establish a business.
Title
Relative to benefits for unemployed persons who are attempting to establish a business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - House - OTP (Y: 183 N: 149 NV: 15 Abs: 50) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-28 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 19 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/11/2013; Chapter 0218; Effective 07/01/2013 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 49, PG.1652 |
2013-05-29 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 183-149; House Journal 45, PG.1511-1513 |
2013-05-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar40, PG.1371-1372 |
2013-05-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 29 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar); House Calendar40, PG.1371 |
2013-05-01 | House | Continued Executive Session: 5/7/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-04-24 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 4/30/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-04-12 | House | Executive Session: 4/24/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 ==RECESSED== |
2013-04-09 | House | Public Hearing: 4/23/2013 1:45 PM Legislative Office Building 307 |
2013-04-03 | House | Introduced and Referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services; House Journal 35, PG.1191 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 19Y-5N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/28/13; Senate Calendar 13 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Hearing: 3/12/13, Room 103, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0522s, Regular Calendar 21Y-3N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; Senate Journal 6 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0522s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0522s, 3/7/13; Senate Calendar 10 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 2/12/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |