NH SB142 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-18 - Signed by the Governor on 07/17/2019; Chapter 252; Effective 07/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring menstrual hygiene products in school restrooms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring menstrual hygiene products in school restrooms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - OTPA (Y: 211 N: 135 NV: 24 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-18SenateSigned by the Governor on 07/17/2019; Chapter 252; Effective 07/17/2019
2019-06-28HouseEnrolled 06/27/2019
2019-06-28SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-13SenateSen. Kahn Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-05-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1478h (NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 211-135 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 68
2019-05-08HouseAmendment # 2019-1478h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 68
2019-05-01HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1611h (NT)
2019-05-01HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1478h (NT) for 05/08/2019 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 15
2019-04-18House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-04-10House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/18/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-03-27HousePublic Hearing: 04/03/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 11 P. 70
2019-02-14SenateSen. Carson Moved to Rerefer, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0306s, Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0306s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSen. Carson Moved to Remove SB142-L from the Consent Calendar; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-07SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0306s, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-30SenateHearing: 02/05/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 9
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=1107&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB142
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=1109&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1109
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1109
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=24&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=SB0142&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB142&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1107
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=190&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=SB0142&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=SB142&ddlsponsors=&lsr=1107

Bill Comments

feedback