NH SB139 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 06/14/2011; Chapter 0186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-14 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 06/14/2011; Chapter 0186
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state recoveries of public assistance caused by fraud.
Title
Relative to state recoveries of public assistance caused by fraud.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. John Gallus [R] | Sen. Sylvia Larsen [D] |
Rep. Amanda Merrill [D] | Sen. Bob Odell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-14 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 06/14/2011; Effective 06/14/2011; Chapter 0186 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-08 | House Enrolled; House Journal 51, PG.1724 | |
2011-05-25 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.1581 | |
2011-05-18 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 25 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 41, PG.1392 | |
2011-05-10 | House Executive Session: 5/17/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-29 | House Public Hearing: 4/14/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-16 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 28, Pg.882 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 8, Pg.99 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0680s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8, Pg.92 | |
2011-03-09 | Senate Sen. D’Allesandro Floor Amendment #2011-0680s; Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8, Pg.92 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/9/11; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2011-02-10 | Senate Hearing: 2/17/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 2:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary, Senate Journal 3, Pg.38 |