NH SB138 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0120; Effective 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0120; Effective 01/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the definition of an "investment metal contract".
Title
Relative to the definition of an "investment metal contract".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1061s (Y: 7 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0979s (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1061s (Y: 7 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0979s (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0120; Effective 01/01/2022 |
2021-07-01 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 5 |
2021-05-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 5 |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive Session: 05/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93883325643 |
2021-04-21 | House | Public Hearing: 04/27/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96624100489 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-04-13 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 04/09/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 7 P. 100 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0979s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2021-1061s, Regular Calendar 7Y-17N, Amendment Failed; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0979s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; [&]; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Moved to Remove SB 138 from the Consent Calendar; 04/01/2021; Senate Journal 10 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0979s, 04/01/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/16/2021, 09:15 am, on proposed amendment # 2021-0543s; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/16/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3 |