NH SB136 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Reconsider (Rep. C. McGuire): Motion Failed Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-28 - Reconsider (Rep. C. McGuire): Motion Failed Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 37
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to review constitutional amendments pending in Congress regarding the Citizens United decision and related cases that have been introduced in the United States Supreme Court.
Title
Establishing a committee to review constitutional amendments pending in Congress regarding the Citizens United decision and related cases that have been introduced in the United States Supreme Court.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Marcia Moody [D] | Rep. Robert Elliott [R] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Sen. Bette Lasky [D] | Sen. David Pierce [D] | Rep. Wayne Burton [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-08 - House - Reconsider (Y: 160 N: 149 NV: 24 Abs: 66) [FAIL]
2016-01-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 156 N: 152 NV: 26 Abs: 65) [FAIL]
2016-01-07 - House - OTPA (Y: 144 N: 159 NV: 30 Abs: 66) [FAIL]
2016-01-07 - House - ITL (Y: 166 N: 137 NV: 30 Abs: 66) [FAIL]
2016-01-07 - House - OTPA (Y: 144 N: 159 NV: 30 Abs: 66) [FAIL]
2016-01-07 - House - Table (Y: 152 N: 157 NV: 23 Abs: 67) [FAIL]
2016-01-07 - House - Interim Study (Y: 152 N: 154 NV: 26 Abs: 67) [FAIL]
2016-01-08 - House - OTPA (Y: 156 N: 152 NV: 26 Abs: 65) [FAIL]
2016-01-07 - House - OTPA (Y: 144 N: 159 NV: 30 Abs: 66) [FAIL]
2016-01-07 - House - ITL (Y: 166 N: 137 NV: 30 Abs: 66) [FAIL]
2016-01-07 - House - OTPA (Y: 144 N: 159 NV: 30 Abs: 66) [FAIL]
2016-01-07 - House - Table (Y: 152 N: 157 NV: 23 Abs: 67) [FAIL]
2016-01-07 - House - Interim Study (Y: 152 N: 154 NV: 26 Abs: 67) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-28 | House | Reconsider (Rep. C. McGuire): Motion Failed Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 37 |
2016-01-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 166-137 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 35 |
2016-01-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2477h: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 144-159 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 33 |
2016-01-28 | House | Remove from Table (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 33 |
2016-01-28 | House | Lay on Table (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 33 |
2016-01-28 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 160-149 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 31 |
2016-01-28 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2477h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 156-152 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 29 |
2016-01-26 | House | FLAM #2015-2477h (Rep. Weber): Amendment Adopted DV 178-130 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 29 |
2016-01-26 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Hinch): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 152-157 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 27 |
2016-01-26 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 152-154 01/07/2016 House Journal 6 P. 25 |
2015-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 7-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 25 |
2015-10-07 | House | Executive Session: 10/13/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/13/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-05-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session: 5/6/2015 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1038s New Title, and 1138s New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment #2015-1138s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1038s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1038s, New Title, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 1/29/15, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |