NH SB136 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-17 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to review constitutional amendments pending in Congress regarding the Citizens United decision and related cases that have been introduced in the United States Supreme Court.
Title
Establishing a committee to review constitutional amendments pending in Congress regarding the Citizens United decision and related cases that have been introduced in the United States Supreme Court.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Wayne Burton [D] | Rep. Marcia Moody [D] | Sen. Bette Lasky [D] |
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Robert Elliott [R] | Sen. David Pierce [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-17 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2015-11-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 7-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 25 |
2015-10-07 | House | Executive Session: 10/13/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/13/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-05-06 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session: 5/6/2015 12:30 PM Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-04-01 | House | Public Hearing: 4/7/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Legislative Administration (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1038s New Title, and 1138s New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Floor Amendment #2015-1138s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1038s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1038s, New Title, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 1/29/15, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Rules, Enrolled Bills and Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |