NH SB135 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the rates of the business profits tax and the business enterprise tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the rates of the business profits tax and the business enterprise tax.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. D'Allesandro withdraws motion to move the question; 03/14/2019 Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateSen. Morse objects to the motion to move the question; 03/14/2019 Senate Journal 8
2019-03-14SenateWithout Objection, Sen. D'Allesandro Moved the Question; 03/14/2019; Senate Journal 8
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/14/2019; Senate Calendar 13
2019-02-06Senate==TIME CHANGE== Hearing: 02/13/2019, Room 100, State House, 11:45 am; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback