NH SB134 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Part VII. II. Remainder Effective 08/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Part VII. II. Remainder Effective 08/10/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adopting omnibus legislation relative to civil actions and criminal liability.
Title
Adopting omnibus legislation relative to civil actions and criminal liability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 264 N: 113 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 264 N: 113 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - OTPA (Y: 264 N: 113 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part VII. II. Remainder Effective 08/10/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part II. II. Remainder Effective 02/06/2022 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part X Effective 08/10/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part IX Effective 08/10/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part VIII Effective 07/01/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part VII. I. Sections 1 - 4 Effective 01/01/2022 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part VI. IV. Remainder Effective 08/10/2022 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part VI. III. Section 14 Effective 01/01/2022 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part VI. II. Sections 11 - 13 and 15 Effective 10/09/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part VI. I. Sections 1 - 8 Effective 07/ 01/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part V Effective 10/09/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part IV Effective 10/09/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part III Effective 10/09/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part II. I. RSA 456-B:2; VII as inserted by Section 4 and Section 11 Effective 08/10/2021 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 08/10/2021; Chapter 0206 |
2021-08-16 | Senate | Part I Effective 01/01/2022 |
2021-07-28 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-28 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2078e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-07-20 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2078e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2021-2019c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/24/2021; Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-24 | House | Conference Committee Report 2021-2019c: Adopted, Voice Vote 06/24/2021 |
2021-06-17 | House | Conference Committee Report # 2021-2019c Filed 06/10/2021; House Amendment + New Amendment |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/15/2021, 10:30 a.m., Room 100, State House |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Gordon, Rice, Wuelper, McBeath 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Gordon): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 16 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, French, Kahn; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1341h and 2021-1801h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 264-113 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 172 |
2021-06-03 | House | FLAM # 2021-1801h (Rep. Prout): Amendment Adopted DV 185-184 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 172 |
2021-06-03 | House | Amendment # 2021-1341h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 165 |
2021-05-24 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2021-05-24 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1341h (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 25 |
2021-04-20 | House | Executive Session: 05/04/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95312058132 |
2021-04-13 | House | Public Hearing: 04/27/2021 09:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93757868844 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-31 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 50 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0775s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0775s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/18/2021; Senate Journal 8 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0775s, 03/18/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/16/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 3 |