NH SB134 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0152; Effective 08/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-16 - Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0152; Effective 08/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the escheat of United States savings bonds.
Title
Relative to the escheat of United States savings bonds.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/12/2015; Chapter 0152; Effective 08/11/2015 |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 5/28/2015); Senate Journal 17 |
2015-06-03 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1781 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1733e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 5/21/2015); Senate Journal 16 |
2015-05-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-1733EBA: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of 5/6/2015) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Sen. Boutin Concurs with House Amendment #1238h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 13 |
2015-04-29 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1238h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1580 |
2015-04-29 | House | Amendment #1238h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 36, PG. 1580 |
2015-04-17 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1238h for Apr 29 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 32, PG. 1485 |
2015-04-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/8/2015 11:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-04-02 | House | Executive Session: 4/9/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-03-25 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 3/31/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-03-25 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 3/31/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-03-19 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 26, PG. 1275 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Hearing: 3/2/15, Room 103, State House, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 5 |