NH SB13 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB13
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-16 - Retained in Committee
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to recovery of search and rescue expenses.
Title
Relative to recovery of search and rescue expenses.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Donovan Fenton [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Carrie Gendreau [R] |
Rep. George Sykes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Executive Session: 05/16/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-04-11 | House | Public Hearing: 04/18/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-03-20 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Transportation |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 01/19/2023; Senate Journal 4 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/19/2023; Senate Calendar 6 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Hearing: 01/10/2023, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB13 (Carry Over) 2023-05-16 - Retained in Committee