NH SB128 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the policy goal of electric utility restructuring.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the policy goal of electric utility restructuring.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Bradley Floor Amendment 1175s (Y: 17 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-31HouseCommittee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 01/03/2018 (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar)
2017-10-18House==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-10-18HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-10-18House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 10/25/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-10-18HousePublic Hearing on Amendment #2017-2457h: 10/25/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-09-28HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 10/11/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-07-31HouseRetained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/06/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-05-10HouseRetained in Committee
2017-05-03House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/09/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-05-03HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 05/09/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-04-25House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/02/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2017-04-25HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/02/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304
2017-04-12HousePublic Hearing: 04/19/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302-304
2017-04-04HouseIntroduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 11 P. 27
2017-03-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2017-1175s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-30SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment #2017-1175s, Regular Calendar 17Y-6N, Amendment Adopted; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-30SenateCommittee Amendment #2017-0883s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 03/30/2017; Senate Journal 12
2017-03-29SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0883s, 03/30/2017; Senate Calendar 16
2017-03-29SenateSpecial Order SB 128 to 03/30/2017, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/29/2017 Senate Journal 11
2017-03-23SenateSpecial Order SB 128 to the Next Session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/23/2017; Senate Journal 10
2017-03-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0883s, 03/23/2017; Senate Calendar 15
2017-02-15SenateHearing: 02/21/2017, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am, on proposed amendment #2017-0426s; Senate Calendar 11
2017-02-15SenateHearing: 02/21/2017, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 11
2017-01-24SenateIntroduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback