NH SB128 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-06 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to pharmacy benefit managers paying claims.
Title
Relative to pharmacy benefit managers paying claims.
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-06 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/06/2016; Senate Journal 1 |
2015-12-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; 1/6/16; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 49 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 7 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/5/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Hearing:=== RESCHEDULED === 2/3/15, Room 100, State House, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Hearing:=== CANCELLED === 1/27/15, Room 100, State House, 1:40 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |