NH SB123 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 172-136 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 172-136 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 137
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study a carbon reduction investment program for New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a commission to study a carbon reduction investment program for New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] | Rep. Marjorie Shepardson [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Rep. Robert Backus [D] | Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 172-136 06/01/2017 House Journal 17 P. 137 |
2017-05-04 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1145h |
2017-05-04 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 06/01/2017 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 17 |
2017-04-25 | House | Executive Session: 05/02/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-03-22 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/28/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-03-15 | House | Public Hearing: 03/22/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 8 P. 45 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2017-0280s and 2017-0390s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Sen. Avard Floor Amendment #2017-0390s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment #2017-0280s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-0280s, 02/09/2017; Senate Calendar 9 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing: 02/02/2017, Room 103, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |