NH SB121 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Enrolled on June 18 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Enrolled 06/13/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to acquisition rights and easements at Weeks Crossing Dam in the town of Warren by the department of environmental services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to acquisition rights and easements at Weeks Crossing Dam in the town of Warren by the department of environmental services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18HouseEnrolled 06/13/2019
2019-06-18SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/13/2019); Senate Journal 21
2019-06-05HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/05/2019
2019-05-29HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-05-29HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 06/05/2019 (Vote 13-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 27 P. 18
2019-05-17HouseExecutive Session: 05/28/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-05-08HousePublic Hearing: 05/16/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301
2019-05-02HouseReferred to Municipal and County Government 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 7
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 7
2019-04-18HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 6
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/16/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-04-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 04/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-03-26HousePublic Hearing: 04/02/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-03-21HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 11 P. 69
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/14/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-24SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, State House, 11:00 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback