NH SB12 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-22 - Signed by the Governor on 02/22/2017; Chapter 0001; Effective 02/22/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the licensing requirement for carrying a concealed pistol or revolver.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the licensing requirement for carrying a concealed pistol or revolver.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-09 - House of Representatives - OTP (Y: 200 N: 97 NV: 28 Abs: 71) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Sen. Lasky Floor Amendment 0064s (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Sen. Watters Floor Amendment 0029s (Y: 10 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-22SenateSigned by the Governor on 02/22/2017; Chapter 0001; Effective 02/22/2017
2017-02-15SenateEnrolled (In recess 02/09/2017); Senate Journal 6
2017-02-15HouseEnrolled 02/15/2017
2017-02-09HouseReconsider SB 12 (Rep. Hinch): Motion Failed Voice Vote 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 19
2017-02-09HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 200-97 02/09/2017 House Journal 6 P. 17
2017-02-03HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2017-02-03HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/09/2017 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 9
2017-02-03HouseExecutive Session: 02/01/2017 Representatives Hall
2017-01-25HousePublic Hearing: 02/01/2017 10:00 Amendment Representatives Hall
2017-01-23HouseIntroduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 3 P. 21
2017-01-19SenateOught to Pass: Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 01/19/2017; Senate Journal 4
2017-01-19SenateSen. Lasky Floor Amendment #2017-0064s, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 01/19/2017; Senate Journal 4
2017-01-19SenateSen. Watters Floor Amendment #2017-0029s, Regular Calendar 10Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 01/19/2017; Senate Journal 4
2017-01-12SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/19/2017; Senate Calendar 6
2017-01-05SenateHearing: 01/10/2017, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 5
2017-01-03SenateTo Be Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=140&sy=2017&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB12
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2017&id=154&txtFormat=html
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=2&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0012&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB12&ddlsponsors=&lsr=140
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=3&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0012&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB12&ddlsponsors=&lsr=140
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=4&sy=2017&lb=S&eb=SB0012&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB12&ddlsponsors=&lsr=140
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=21&sy=2017&lb=H&eb=SB0012&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2017&txtbillnumber=SB12&ddlsponsors=&lsr=140

Bill Comments

feedback