NH SB12 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/11; Chapter 0241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/11; Chapter 0241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to screening panels for medical injury claims.
Title
Relative to screening panels for medical injury claims.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/11; Chapter 0241 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Enrolled | |
2011-06-22 | House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859 | |
2011-06-22 | Senate Conference Committee Report 2416c; Adopted, Voice Vote | |
2011-06-22 | House Conference Committee Report #2416c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 57, PG.1804 | |
2011-06-16 | House Conference Committee Report #2011-2416c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 49, PG.1673 | |
2011-06-15 | House Conferee Change: Rep Giuda Replaces Rep Weber; House Journal 51, PG.1727 | |
2011-06-09 | Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/14/2011, 12:00 p.m., Room 101, Legislative Office Building | |
2011-06-08 | House Speaker Appoints: Reps Rowe, Weber, Peterson, and B.Palmer; House Journal 51, PG.1723 | |
2011-06-08 | House House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1723 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate President Appoints: Senators Houde, Groen and Luther; Senate Journal 20, Pg.549 | |
2011-06-08 | Senate Sen. Houde Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 2150h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.549 | |
2011-06-01 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #2150h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1629-1630 | |
2011-06-01 | House Amendment #2150h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1629-1630 | |
2011-05-25 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2150h; House Calendar 43, PG.1512-1513 | |
2011-05-25 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2150h for June 1 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 43, PG.1496 | |
2011-05-10 | House Executive Session: 5/24/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:00 Amendment)== | |
2011-04-27 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 5/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-29 | House Public Hearing: 4/12/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-03-17 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 30, PG.1036 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 9, Pg.161 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0800s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.136 | |
2011-03-16 | Senate Committee Amendment 0800s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.136 | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0800s, 3/16/2011; Senate Calendar 15A | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Hearing: 2/10/2011, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary, Senate Journal 3, Pg.32 |