NH SB117 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Pending Motion Rerefer to Committee; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to certain procedures conducted in teaching hospitals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certain procedures conducted in teaching hospitals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenatePending Motion Rerefer to Committee; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-28SenateSen. Hennessey Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 15Y-8N, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-08SenateHearing: 03/12/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 03:00 pm; Senate Calendar 13
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback