NH SB114 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-09 - Pending Motion OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to payment by the state of a portion of retirement system contributions of political subdivision employers.
Title
Relative to payment by the state of a portion of retirement system contributions of political subdivision employers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-09 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 02/09/2023; Senate Journal 6 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Senate Calendar 9A |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 103, State House, 01:55 pm; Senate Calendar 8 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4 |